U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Lopez-Ramos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • January 29, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • July 30, 2019: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • July 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2019: [Docket]
  • July 11, 2019: [Reservation of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Interpreter]
  • July 11, 2019: [Oath of Interpreter]
  • July 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.