U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00191-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ontiveros-Serna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Amended Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 28, 2019: [Extension of Time]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 25, 2019: [Extension of Time]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • July 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 30, 2019: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Docket]
  • July 14, 2019: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Interpreter]
  • July 12, 2019: [Oath of Interpreter]
  • July 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.