U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-mj-00110-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ballou
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • October 11, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • October 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report]
  • May 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2018: [Docket Call]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Consent & Order to Modify Conditions of Release (PS-42)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2018: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2018: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 28, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2018: [Docket Call]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.