U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-mj-00090-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Harris
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Docket Call]
  • August 06, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • August 06, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 06, 2020: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • August 05, 2020: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 10, 2020: [Docket Call]
  • June 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • April 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • April 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 11, 2018: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 07, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 07, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • March 07, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • February 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 15, 2018: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.