U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-mj-00086-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Rice
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 16, 2018: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2018: [Bond]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Preliminary Examination]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.