U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-07016
  • Case Name: First National Bank of Omaha v. Stockert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • August 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 13, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • August 13, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • July 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • June 29, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 29, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.