U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30646
  • Case Name: Ferris Terrell Nance, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
February, 2020
  • February 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
November, 2019
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.