U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30316
  • Case Name: Danielle Marie Eley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
June, 2022
  • June 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit of Noncompliance]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan (after confirmation)]
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • March 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update Claim]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Wage Assignment Order]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulated Application for Wage Assignment]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Claim]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • October 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan (after confirmation)]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
November, 2019
  • November 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • August 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.