U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00287-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PARADA-GALVEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 14, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • September 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 02, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 14, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • January 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 29, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • October 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.