U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00311-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RABOUIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 05, 2023: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Factual Basis Document]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • November 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 14, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • November 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Arrest]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 17, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • May 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.