U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00298-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARKOVSKAJA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • July 25, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.