U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00312-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDWARDS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • February 08, 2022: [Motion for Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 07, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2021: [Motion for Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.