U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00313-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOLOMON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • February 11, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 11, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 13, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.