U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00316-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROGERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 19, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • November 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 21, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.