U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00310-3
  • Case Name: USA v. ROSALES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 16, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • December 14, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • August 19, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 16, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • August 02, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 26, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • July 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • July 15, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 13, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • June 17, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 15, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 09, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 08, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 24, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 23, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 16, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • May 05, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 03, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 26, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 25, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 12, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [SEALED USPO Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 02, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • March 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • March 01, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 16, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 08, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • February 02, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 28, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 23, 2021: [Expedite]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 17, 2021: [Request]
  • December 17, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • December 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 05, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2021: [Request]
  • December 02, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 02, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 28, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 28, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • October 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arrest]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 30, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • September 27, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 24, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 23, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2021: [Request]
  • September 22, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Request]
  • September 21, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • September 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • September 20, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 09, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • September 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 08, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 08, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 07, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 31, 2021: [Preliminary Exam (Hearing) and Detention Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Preliminary Exam (Hearing) and Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.