U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TUCKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 21, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 20, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 20, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • October 20, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.