U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00288-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARCIA-EUCEDA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 19, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • December 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 30, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 24, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.