U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00295-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STALEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • October 25, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • October 24, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Correct]
  • October 20, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • October 18, 2022: [Correct]
  • October 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 02, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 17, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 16, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 16, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 09, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.