U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00309-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERNANDEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • August 21, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 05, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • June 29, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 28, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.