U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00289-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CROUCH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 21, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 02, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 06, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.