U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00290-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MEDLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 26, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • April 20, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 20, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • April 19, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 19, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 17, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 02, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 16, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 07, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.