U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00292-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON-MOORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice-Other]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 19, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 13, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 06, 2023: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • August 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 05, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 29, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 29, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • July 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2022: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.