U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00300-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILDER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 23, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • June 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 04, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 09, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.