U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00302-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOLEMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 08, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.