U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00304-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUNLAP
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 06, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 08, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • February 15, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 18, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.