U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00306-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUTTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [SEALED Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [SEALED Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.