U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00303-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BEST
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 19, 2023: [USCA Opinion]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
August, 2022
  • August 13, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • July 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • June 28, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 21, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 18, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 14, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 04, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • January 03, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • December 14, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 22, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.