U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00305-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUNSTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • October 05, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 03, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 02, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 15, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 10, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 10, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.