U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCOY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • August 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.