U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 08, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply to Response ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
November, 2022
  • November 27, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • November 27, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Document]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 26, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 26, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 19, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 15, 2021: [Strike ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Response to Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 08, 2021: [Response to Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.