U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McLaurin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.