U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00334-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goode
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 19, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 19, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • July 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 30, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 05, 2022: [SEALED Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 11, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 11, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • August 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.