U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00335-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daye
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Set Aside Forfeiture ]
  • January 19, 2023: [USCA Case Number ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Request]
  • July 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • July 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 11, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 11, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.