U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fennell-Best
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 05, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
  • July 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
  • June 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.