U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Norris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Seal ]
  • April 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 08, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • January 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2022: [Release Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 08, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 18, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 11, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • November 11, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.