U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Docket Call]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 09, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.