U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ragsdale
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.