U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hinton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Sealed Document]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.