U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • February 22, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 07, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
November, 2021
  • November 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 13, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 24, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.