U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GLOVER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Garnishment]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • January 11, 2022: [Garnishment]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Declaration of Proof of Service]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • October 19, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Application for Writ by USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.