U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scronce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2022: [Exhibit]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 20, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 02, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 22, 2021: [Indictment]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 24, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.