U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00324-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carmichael
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • November 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 14, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 19, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.