U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00326-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burrows
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for 5K Departure]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sentencing ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.