U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00327-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 19, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.