U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00328-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hines
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.