U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00329-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barnes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 17, 2023: [SEALED Appeal Transcript ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 19, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.