U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00330-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Person
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 06, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • May 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 31, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.