U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00331-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 16, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 27, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 27, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.