U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00332-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edwards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 27, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 27, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • January 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2021: [Release Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 04, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • November 04, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.