U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00196-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aldana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - USSC/USC Amendments]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [Screening Order]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 20, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • September 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 19, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 12, 2022: [In Limine]
  • September 12, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 24, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Seal Document]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Reset Docket Call and Excludable]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Seal Document]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • October 11, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 06, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arrest]
  • October 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.